This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 16:03:01 (UTC).

BRADLEY VS BILLIE J & JESSIE M CASKEY

Case Summary

On 08/31/2017 BRADLEY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BILLIE J JESSIE M CASKEY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2039

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRADLEY, CECILY

Defendants

BILLIE J & JESSIE M CASKEY

CASKEY, BILLIE J

CASKEY, JESSIE M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ENERLE, STEPHEN D

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Request for dismissal rejected: 2nd rejection. Please submit a letter to the court why a Petition to Approve the compromise of a pending action or proceeding in which a minor/person with a disability has not been filed. Returned via efile

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 11/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CRC 3.1385; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: ENERLE, STEPHEN D; Defendant; Attorney: ENERLE, STEPHEN D

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 10-2-2018: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: (1) Please submit a letter to the court why a Petition to Approve the compromise of a pending action or proceeding in which a person with a disability has not been filed. (2) Guardian Ad Litem needs to sign request for dismissal. Returned via efile

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 9-6-18: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel 05/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4/12/18 Defendant, BILLIE J CASKEY Motion for an Order Compelling Plaintiff Cecily Bradley to Answer to Form Interrogatories without Objection and for Monetary Sanctions ResID: 29601; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: ENERLE, STEPHEN D; Defendant; Attorney: ENERLE, STEPHEN D

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 02/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: BRADLEY, CECILY; Defendant; Attorney: ENERLE, STEPHEN D; Defendant; Attorney: ENERLE, STEPHEN D

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO: STEPHEN D. ENERLE DOCUMENT: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS & NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES DEFENDANTS NAMES ARE INCONSISTENT. ARE YOU RESPONDING FOR TWO OR ONE PARTY WHO WAS ERRONEOUSLY LISTED AS TWO? NOTICE OF JURY FEES & JURY FEES WERE REJECTED AS ANSWER WAS REJECTED.

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 12/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: as to Order Dismissing Action dated 01/22/2019, re- mailed to address provided by Post Master on 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 11/27/2018: Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 01/16/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Court to dismiss action if Gaurdian does not appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Request for dismissal rejected: 2nd rejection. Please submit a letter to the court why a Petition to Approve the compromise of a pending action or proceeding in which a minor/person with a disability has not been filed. Returned via efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 11/27/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Minute Order Dated 10-2-2018: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO: STEPHEN D. ENERLE DOCUMENT: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS & NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES DEFENDANTS NAMES ARE INCONSISTENT. ARE YOU RESPONDING FOR TWO OR ONE PARTY WHO WAS ERRONEOUSLY LISTED AS TWO? NOTICE OF JURY FEES & JURY FEES WERE REJECTED AS ANSWER WAS REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 12/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN B**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketApplication / Order Appointing Guardian ad Litem (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: APPOINTING BRENDON BAILEY AS GAL FOR CECILY BRADLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:12/14/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less