This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 15:01:29 (UTC).

BOWMAN ASPHALT VS CAL-PAC ENGINEERING

Case Summary

On 02/14/2014 BOWMAN ASPHALT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CAL-PAC ENGINEERING. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1311

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOWMAN ASPHALT, INC.

Defendants

CAL - PAC ENGINEERING, INC.

PAE, TIM

CAL-PAC ENGINEERING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

IDE, NATHAN D

815 W Center Ave

Visalia, CA 93291

ROLLIN, HAROLD L

 

Court Documents

Debtor's Examination

debtors exam MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: ROLLIN, HAROLD L; Defendant: PAE, TIM

Debtor's Examination

debtors exam MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: AS TO CAL-PAC & TIM PAE; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: ROLLIN, HAROLD L; Defendant: PAE, TIM

Debtor's Examination

DEBTORS EXAM MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Debtor returning on bench warrant Debtor has not been arrested, cite/release or bailed out ***warrant is still active*** Debtor: Tim Pae & Cal-Pac Engineering Co. Inc; Parties Present Plaintiff: BOWMAN ASPHALT, INC.; Attorney: ROLLIN, HAROLD L; Defendant: PAE, TIM

Debtor's Examination

CV281311: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: as to Cal-Pac Engineering Co., INC., Tim Pae; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: ROLLIN, HAROLD L

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2017
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied - Comment: county of orange

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • DocketDebtor's Examination - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: FURTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter From: Harrold L Rollin Date of Letter: 1-14-16 Date letter received: 1-19-16 Re:requesting debtor's examination set for 1-20-16 off the court's calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDebtor's Examination - debtors exam MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDebtor's Examination - debtors exam MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: AS TO CAL-PAC & TIM PAE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: BENCH WARRANT, WARRANT RECALLED BY COURT, AS TO, TIM PAE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • DocketRecalled B/W-Attachment for Defaulters Returned from Sheriff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: CIVIL SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM AND DECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDebtor's Examination - DEBTORS EXAM MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Debtor returning on bench warrant Debtor has not been arrested, cite/release or bailed out ***warrant is still active*** Debtor: Tim Pae & Cal-Pac Engineering Co. Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: set for 9-2-15 at 8:30 a.m. in department 17 re debtor's examination and active bench warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2014
  • DocketWrit Reissued No Fee - Comment: AS TO CAL-PAC ENGINEERING CO., INC PERSONALLY SERVED 3/20/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE RETURNED VIA SASE - UNABLE TO FILE AN AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE NO PREVIOUS ON FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE: NAME OF PARTY SERVED DOES NOT CONFORM TO THE PARTY ON THE COMPLAINT. RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO TIM PAE PERSONAL SERVICE 3/20/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for BOWMAN ASPHALT, INC. (PL-1). Received from NATHAN D IDE, check no(s) 4582. Receipt #764560 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON May 30, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON May 30, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY NATHAN D. IDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY NATHAN D. IDE CMC SET 8/13/14 @8:15AM DEPT 17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOWMAN ASPHALT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant