This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 07:19:58 (UTC).

BOWEN VS STATE FARM MUTUAL

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 BOWEN filed an Other lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1408

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BOWEN, LANDON

Respondent

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EISNER, ALEXANDER C.

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Alexandar C Eisner Re: Proposed Order Reason: Premature filing

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Alexander C. Eisner Re: Notice of Hearing Reason: Hearing time not specified

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketPetition - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: Petition to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of taking Petition to Compel Arbitration off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Petition to Compel Arbitration 8/12/21, 830am, Dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Alexandar C Eisner Re: Proposed Order Reason: Premature filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Alexander C. Eisner Re: Notice of Hearing Reason: Hearing time not specified

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: BOWEN, LANDON; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPetition to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EISNER ALEXANDER C