Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:01:19 (UTC).

BOTELLO VS HERRERA

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 BOTELLO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HERRERA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D., Fielder, John L. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1654

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Fielder, John L.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BOTELLO, MANUEL BRAVO

Respondent

HERRERA, ANTONIA PENALOZA

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Respondent

REQUEST FOR ORDER - RE: MOVE OUT AND PROPERTY: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES PROP RESTRAINT PROP CONTROL MOVE OUT 16COURT--11COURT; Parties Present Petitioner: BOTELLO, MANUEL BRAVO; Respondent: HERRERA, ANTONIA PENALOZA

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; HEARING ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO MANUEL BOTELLO: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW $435; Parties Present Petitioner: BOTELLO, MANUEL BRAVO

Mandatory Settlement Conference

**MO - Judgment - Public: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: EST TIME 1.5 HRS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Judgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: STATUS 3/10/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Mediation Agreement - Comment: JLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - **MO - Judgment - Public: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: EST TIME 1.5 HRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Settlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Trial Status - Comment: Conference Hearing Date: 1/14/16 Hearing Time: 1:30 P.M. Department/Division: MC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Declaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • At Issue Court Trial < 1 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted In Whole - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: RES HRG DATE: 9/2/15 DIV. B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing on Waiver of Fees - Original Type: Hearing on Waiver of Fees; HEARING ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO MANUEL BOTELLO: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW $435; Parties Present Petitioner: BOTELLO, MANUEL BRAVO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Revenue Recovery Financial Evaluation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: PET HRG 07/24/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less