This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 15:05:14 (UTC).

BORUNDA VS MARQUEZ

Case Summary

On 01/07/2016 BORUNDA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARQUEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tafoya, Robert S. and McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0004

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tafoya, Robert S.

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BORUNDA, ERIKA

Respondent

MARQUEZ, JUAN C

 

Court Documents

Motion - DCSS (Enforcement)

Motion - DCSS (Enforcement) 05/02/2018: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DCSS NOM SET ASIDE DFLT JUDGEMENT FILED ON 11/15/17 2 MINORS CONTINUED FROM 3/15/18; Parties Present Respondent: MARQUEZ, JUAN C

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/16/2016: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: BORUNDA, ERIKA; Respondent: MARQUEZ, JUAN C

Mandatory Settlement Conference

06/10/16 MO - Mandatory Settlement Conference: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: BORUNDA, ERIKA; Respondent: MARQUEZ, JUAN C

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Interpreter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Interpreter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketDCSS: Findings and Order After Hearing - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Comment: HRG 05/02/2018 DIV A FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - DCSS (Enforcement) - Motion - DCSS (Enforcement) 05/02/2018: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DCSS NOM SET ASIDE DFLT JUDGEMENT FILED ON 11/15/17 2 MINORS CONTINUED FROM 3/15/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketDCSS: Stipulation to Continue and Order Thereon - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketMotion - DCSS (Enforcement) - Original Type: Motion - DCSS (Enforcement); Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Stipulated Continuance; Comment: DCSS NOM SET ASIDE DFLT JUDGEMENT FILED ON 11/15/17 2 MINORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Enforcement (DCSS) - Comment: Re: DCSS NOM SET ASIDE DFLT JUDGEMENT FILED ON 11/15/17 2 MINORS Hearing Date: 3/15/18 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketDCSS: (Default)Judgment re Parental Obligations-Supplemental - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Comment: 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default - Comment: DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2016
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE COURT DATE: 06/10/16 TIME: 9:00 AM DIV: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • DocketAt-Issue Memorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: BORUNDA, ERIKA; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.