Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:01:27 (UTC).

BOOHER, Jr. VS JACKSON BOOKER

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 BOOHER, Jr filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JACKSON BOOKER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1656

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BOOHER, ROBERT, Jr.

Respondent

JACKSON BOOKER, SHILOE KARINE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 01/14/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less