This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:49:58 (UTC).

BONNIE JEAN RICHARDSON DECEASED

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 BONNIE JEAN RICHARDSON DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2255

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioners

FINDLEY, JERRI DELPHIA

RICHARDSON, ARCHIE LLOYD

JOLLY, JESSICA

PIERCE, STEVEN DANIEL

RICHARDSON, LEE WAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RICHARDSON, RAE

 

Court Documents

Petition to Determine Succession

Petition to Determine Succession 12/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PROPER TO BE SUBMITTED ON THE PLEADING (PSP)

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Corrected Inventory & Appraisal; Attachment 11; returned via attorney outbasket "R" (SASE not provided)

Petition to Determine Succession

Petition to Determine Succession 09/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: ***MATTER SUBMITTED AS PSP HOWEVER DOES NOT QUALIFY UNTIL PROBATE NOTE HAS BEEN CLEARED. APPEARANCE AT HEARING IS REQUIRED*** NOTES - 1. Caption of the Inventory and Appraisal is incomplete and address of the real property does not match appraisal report attachment thereto (Oildale vs. Bakersfield?). Need a Corrected Final Inventory and Appraisal and new Attachment 11 re same. 2. Need date of death of predeceased spouse. 3. Is daughter, Edena Lea Childress a predeceased child? If yes, need date of death and the names of her children by way of verified supplement. 4. Will gives diamond wedding rings to daughter, Edenea Lea Childress. What is the disposition of the personal property? Need clarificaiton by way of verified supplement.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: RICHARDSON, RAE; Petitioner; Attorney: RICHARDSON, RAE; Petitioner; Attorney: RICHARDSON, RAE; Petitioner; Attorney: RICHARDSON, RAE; Petitioner; Attorney: RICHARDSON, RAE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition to Determine; returned via SASE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition to Determine; returned via SASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketOrder Determining Succession - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Comment: Order Determining Succession to Real Property and Personal Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Determine Succession - Petition to Determine Succession 12/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PROPER TO BE SUBMITTED ON THE PLEADING (PSP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketInventory with Property Tax Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: attachment 11 cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Corrected Inventory & Appraisal; Attachment 11; returned via attorney outbasket "R" (SASE not provided)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Determine Succession - Petition to Determine Succession 09/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: ***MATTER SUBMITTED AS PSP HOWEVER DOES NOT QUALIFY UNTIL PROBATE NOTE HAS BEEN CLEARED. APPEARANCE AT HEARING IS REQUIRED*** NOTES - 1. Caption of the Inventory and Appraisal is incomplete and address of the real property does not match appraisal report attachment thereto (Oildale vs. Bakersfield?). Need a Corrected Final Inventory and Appraisal and new Attachment 11 re same. 2. Need date of death of predeceased spouse. 3. Is daughter, Edena Lea Childress a predeceased child? If yes, need date of death and the names of her children by way of verified supplement. 4. Will gives diamond wedding rings to daughter, Edenea Lea Childress. What is the disposition of the personal property? Need clarificaiton by way of verified supplement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: Affidavit of Attorney Rae Richardson in support of Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketPetition to Determine Succession - Comment: Petition to Determine Succession to Real Property and Personal Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition to Determine; returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketLast Will & Testament Received/Lodged - Comment: Will number BRW-17-001091; (4) Four page will dated: 01/18/1991

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition to Determine; returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.