This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 13:48:53 (UTC).

BOKIS VS GARCIA BOKIS

Case Summary

On 11/14/2016 BOKIS filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against GARCIA BOKIS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0391

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BOKIS, RICKEY D.

Respondent

GARCIA BOKIS, NANCY L

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Court Trial

Court Trial 09/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Petitioner: BOKIS, RICKEY D.; Respondent: GARCIA BOKIS, NANCY L

Confirmation of Special Setting

Confirmation of Special Setting 09/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 07/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: BOKIS, RICKEY D.; Respondent: GARCIA BOKIS, NANCY L

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketQualified Domestic Relations Order - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial - Court Trial 09/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConfirmation of Special Setting - Confirmation of Special Setting 09/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 07/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • DocketAmended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: PER COURT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.