This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/15/2020 at 07:20:11 (UTC).

BOJORQUEZ-VALENZUELA VS GIL

Case Summary

On 03/17/2020 BOJORQUEZ-VALENZUELA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GIL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0053

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BOJORQUEZ-VALENZUELA, MARIA OFELIA

Respondent

GIL, ALFREDO OTILIO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: FW-003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: BOJORQUEZ-VALENZUELA, MARIA OFELIA; Served: 05/15/20207:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: **ENDORSED COPIES MAILED 03/24/2020 TO AMS DUE TO COURT CLOSURES**

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.