This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/26/2020 at 09:37:10 (UTC).

BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. VS SINGH ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 BMO HARRIS BANK N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SINGH. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2232

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.

Defendants

SINGH, AMANDEEP

GTB TRANSPORT INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDONIAN, PAUL N

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/8/21 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 10

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Writ of Possession (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: as to GTB Transport Inc. a California Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Writ of Possession (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: as to Amandeep Singh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketPoints and Authorities - Comment: of Judith Hatch in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Judith Hatch in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNotice / Application for Writ of Possession - Comment: Hrg: 12/14/20 @ 8:30 am in Dept. 10 as to Amandeep Singh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: as to Amandeep Singh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNotice / Application for Writ of Possession - Comment: Hrg: 12/14/20 @ 8:30 am in Dept. 10 as to GTB Transport Inc. a California Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: GTB Transport Inc. a California Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/8/21 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less