This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 23:39:46 (UTC).

BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. VS DAVERY ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/17/2017 BMO HARRIS BANK N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAVERY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2463

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.

Defendants

DAVERY, MEHDI

DALIAN CONSTRUCTION INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOPEZ, JOSHUA

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: The Confession of Judgment is of Poor Image Quality, a verticle line appears an all pages. Please correct and resubmit.

Ruling

Ruling 07/23/2019: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Case was dsmissed on 12/26/2018. Dismissal must be set aside in order to Request Judgment, form CIV-100. Make sure to Identify by name the Defendant for who the Judgment is against.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proposed order rejected: Proof of service required. Returned via efile

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel 10/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 8/29/18 Plaintiff, BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A. Motion to Compel Discovery Responses by Defendants ResID: 32871

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice of stay of proceedings rejected: Duplicate filing. Notice of stay of proceedings filed on 10/12/2018 by defendant's counsel. Returned via SVAS

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 10-15-18: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: Notice of Stay as to Dalian Construction Inc., Only

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 07/17/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 04/17/2018; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: LOPEZ, JOSHUA

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Case Management Statement returned via attorney bin

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice and Acknowledgement must be attached to Mandatory Judicial Council Form POS-010.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 2/1/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketDebtor's Examination - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: as to Mehdi Davery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketRequest - Comment: to Cancel Debtor's Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: Hearing Date: 3/17/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDebtor's Examination - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: as to MEHDI DAVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketRequest - Comment: Vacate Debtor's Examination of Mehdi Davery scheduled for 12/10/2019 at 8:30 a.m., Department 17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: as to MEHDI DAVERY Hearing Date: 12/10/19 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: County of Kern, Returned via e-file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Request for issuance of Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Summary Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Acknowledgement and Receipt - Comment: Summons/Complaint. As to Dalian construction, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Acknowledgement and Receipt - Comment: Summons/complaint. As to Mehdi Davery.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Notice and Acknowledgement must be attached to Mandatory Judicial Council Form POS-010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 02/01/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Counsel's Declaration Re: Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Serve Defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 2/1/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/30/2018; Served: 01/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less