This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/04/2020 at 01:10:15 (UTC).

BLAY, Jr. VS BLAY (D)

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 BLAY, Jr filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BLAY D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McKnight, Ralph L., Jr., Loo, Cynthia L., Cannon, Gloria, Louie, Chad A., Bittleston, Dawn and Camacho, Marcos R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2808

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

Loo, Cynthia L.

Cannon, Gloria

Louie, Chad A.

Bittleston, Dawn

Camacho, Marcos R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BLAY, RANDALL LEE, Jr.

Respondent

BLAY, CHANDA MARDE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FALK, STEPHANIE H

Respondent Attorney

THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Hearing on Waiver of Fees 10/26/2018: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES FW FEES: $435.00

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 01/28/2019: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/16/18 RES S/S SET ASIDE JUDGMENT CONT FROM 11/30/18

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 03/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/16/18 RES S/S ETA: 2 hours CONT FROM 11/30/18 1/29/19

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 07/03/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/16/18 RES S/S ETA: 2 hours CONT FROM 11/30/18 1/29/19, 3/06/19

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 01/07/2020: Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/16/18 RES S/S CONT FROM 11/30/18 1/29/19, 3/06/19, 7/03/19

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 02/18/2020: Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/16/18 RES S/S CONT FROM 11/30/18 1/29/19, 3/06/19, 7/03/19 01/07/20

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: 10/16/18 RES S/S CONT FROM 11/30/18 1/29/19, 3/06/19, 7/03/19 01/07/20, 02/18/20 T/E: 2 HOURS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 02/18/2020: Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/16/18 RES S/S CONT FROM 11/30/18 1/29/19, 3/06/19, 7/03/19 01/07/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketBrief - Comment: E-FILED: BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 01/07/2020: Judicial Officer: Louie, Chad A.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/16/18 RES S/S CONT FROM 11/30/18 1/29/19, 3/06/19, 7/03/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 07/03/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 10/16/18 RES S/S ETA: 2 hours CONT FROM 11/30/18 1/29/19, 3/06/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Comment: HRG: 1/28/19 SIGNED PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 635

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketAmended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: A SIMPLE DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMPSON, FRANCIS LUTIE