This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/19/2018 at 04:42:37 (UTC).

BLAKELY VS DAUGHERTY, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/21/2015 BLAKELY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DAUGHERTY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillips, Craig G. and Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0105

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Phillips, Craig G.

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLAKELY, KEITH EDWARD

Defendants

DAUGHERTY, DEBORAH JEAN

DAUGHERTY, DEBRA JEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMACK, SANDRA KUHN

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

MO - Unlawful Detainer Trial 121015: Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: Answer filed By Deborah Jean Daughtery being sued as Debra Jean Daugherty; Parties Present Plaintiff: BLAKELY, KEITH EDWARD; Defendant: DAUGHERTY, DEBRA JEAN; Defendant: DAUGHERTY, DEBORAH JEAN

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: Returned Original Via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: In Pro Per New Attorney: Sandra Kuhn McCormack

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • Stipulation for Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - MO - Unlawful Detainer Trial 121015: Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Comment: Answer filed By Deborah Jean Daughtery being sued as Debra Jean Daugherty; Parties Present Plaintiff: BLAKELY, KEITH EDWARD; Defendant: DAUGHERTY, DEBRA JEAN; Defendant: DAUGHERTY, DEBORAH JEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • Notice of Trial - Comment: Mailed to All Parties. Set for 12/3/15 10:00 AM Dept A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • Request/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Answer - Comment: filed by Deborah Jean Daugherty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 217 ASH ST TAFT, CA 93268 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned via In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less