This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:42:55 (UTC).

BISHOP VS BISHOP

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 BISHOP filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BISHOP. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1911

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BISHOP, ROBBIN

Respondent

BISHOP, SHELLE

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 11/15/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Acknowledgement and Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: A HELPING HAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less