This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:48:36 (UTC).

BIRRUETA VS HEREDIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 BIRRUETA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HEREDIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Clark, Thomas S., Lampe, David R. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2510

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Clark, Thomas S.

Lampe, David R.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIRRUETA, RIGOBERTO

Defendants

HEREDIA, CELIA

HEREDIA, STEVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRILL, THOMAS A

Defendant Attorneys

Davis, Bruce Carl

FRASHER, MARSHALL C

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 09/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Set per stipulation filed 8/15/2017; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BRILL, THOMAS A

Case Management Conference

12/08/16 MO: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BRILL, THOMAS A

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2018
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: T/E 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Comment: Jury Trial 07/16/18; T/E 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: T/E 5 DAYS (D-4) FCMC 7/06/18 TD 7/16/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Notice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: T/E 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former attorney: Timothy J, O'Shea, New attorney: Marshall C. Frasher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former attorney: Timothy J, O'Shea, New attorney: Marshall C. Frasher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Association of Attorney - Comment: Association of Attorney Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 03:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: Jury Trial 10/02/17; T/E 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2016
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Substitution of Attorney - Steve Heredia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Association of counsel missing required bar number for attorney to be associated. Returned via US Postal Courtesy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Notice of Transfer of Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference - Comment: TIME:08:00 AM DATE:12/8/16 DEPT.:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: BIRRUETA, RIGOBERTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Records Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Complaint - Fast Track - Comment: TRANSFERRED FROM SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. SEE ENTRY 2181

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Notice of Receipt of Record

    Read MoreRead Less