This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 22:38:46 (UTC).

BIREN VS KERN COUNTY SUPERINTENDENT OF SCHOOLS

Case Summary

On 06/22/2020 BIREN filed an Other lawsuit against KERN COUNTY SUPERINTENDENT OF SCHOOLS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1433

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIREN, MATTHEW B.F.

Defendants

KERN COUNTY SUPERINTENDENT OF SCHOOLS

SANTANA, MARIBEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

BIREN, MATTHEW B F

HAGAN, CHRISTOPHER J

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 11/17/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 04:00 PM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 11/17/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 04:00 PM; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketAnswer to First Amended Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint (No Fee)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Assignment / Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: and Order to Show Cause.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Transfer In. Kern County Case number issued BCV-20-101433

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 03/10/2020 Minute Order Issued by Los Angeles Superior Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 01/30/2020 Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed in Los Angeles Superior Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 01/09/2020 Notice of Deposit of Interplead Funds Filed in Los Angeles Superior Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 01/08/2020 Notice of Case Management Conference file in Los Angeles Superior Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 01/07/20 First Amended Complaint in Interpleader filed in Los Angeles Superior Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 12/18/19 Notice of Case Assignment issued by Los Angeles Superior Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 12/18/19 Summons Issued by Los Angeles Superior Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: 12/18/19 Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed in Los Angeles Superior Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: 12/18/19 Complaint in Interpleader filed in Los Angeles County.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketRegister of Actions / Docket Change of Venue - Comment: Transfer in from Los Angeles County Superior Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KERN COUNTY SUPERINTENDENT OF SCHOOLS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIREN MATTHEW B.F.