Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 18:59:40 (UTC).

BIOLAB, INC. VS HOME AND LEISURE INC

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 BIOLAB, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HOME AND LEISURE INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brehmer, Charles R. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0447

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brehmer, Charles R.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIOLAB, INC.

Defendant

HOME AND LEISURE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA, RUDOLFO

 

Court Documents

Case Status Conference

**MO - Public DEFAULT: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: /default

Case Management Conference

**MO - Public cmc: Judicial Officer: Brehmer, Charles R.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: BIOLAB, INC.; Awarded Against: HOME AND LEISURE INC; Amount; Damages: $271,295.06; Pre-Judgment Interest: $113,587.71; Attorney Fees: $1,000.00; Costs: $515.00; Total: $386397.77; Party: Names: BIOLAB, INC.; HOME AND LEISURE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN/ MONEY RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Default - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: /JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: AS TO HOME AND LEISURE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: OF RUDY GABA JR PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: OF RUDY GABA JR IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: OF RUDY GABA JR IN SUPPORT OF CALUCLATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AS TO HOME AND LEISURE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - **MO - Public cmc: Judicial Officer: Brehmer, Charles R.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Notice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: by personal service as to Home and Leisure Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/28/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less