This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:47:35 (UTC).

BINFORD VS BINFORD

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 BINFORD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BINFORD. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pritchard, Kenneth G. and Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0086

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BINFORD, SHERRIE LYNN

Respondent

BINFORD, WILBERT WALTER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Preliminary/Final Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.