This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 20:30:15 (UTC).

BILSON VS COLLEGE COMMUNITY SERVICES

Case Summary

On 02/27/2015 BILSON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against COLLEGE COMMUNITY SERVICES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4242

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BILSON, KARI

Defendants

COLLEGE COMMUNITY SERVICES

PROVIDENCE COMMUNITY SERVICE, LLC

HUYNH, TRANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RUBY, EMILY A

Attorney at LAW OFC DAVID H GREENBERG

6100 Wilshire Blvd #1170

Los Angeles, CA 90048

AARONS, MARTIN I

Defendant Attorney

OROZCO, ROBERT A

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

11/14/16 MO: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/30/16; 10/11/16 Re-notice Plaintiff, KARI BILSON Motion to Compel Further Responses to Defendant's Responses to Form Interrogatories, General, Set 01 and for monetary sanctions of $3480.00 ResID: 18107 ***************************************** TENTATIVE: MOTION TO COMPEL IS MOOT AS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES 12.1 - 12.7. DENY MOTION AS TO FORM INTERROGATORY NO. 17.1. SEPARATE STATEMENT FAILS TO COMPLY WITH CRC RULE 3.1345(c). GRANT SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1770. ***************************************************; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: OROZCO, ROBERT A; Defendant; Attorney: OROZCO, ROBERT A; Defendant; Attorney: OROZCO, ROBERT A

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

11/10/16 MO; Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/30/16 Plaintiff, KARI BILSON Motion to Compel Further Responses & Production of Documents to Defendant's Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set 2, and for Monetary Sanctions of $3345.00 against Defendants and its Counsel ResID: 18095 ********************************************* TENTATIVE: GRANT MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES. GRANT APPLICATION FOR SANCTIONS IN THE TOTAL AMOUNT OF $1995. ****************************************************; Parties Present Plaintiff: BILSON, KARI; Defendant; Attorney: OROZCO, ROBERT A; Defendant; Attorney: OROZCO, ROBERT A; Defendant; Attorney: OROZCO, ROBERT A

Case Management Conference

Minute Order - CMC - 09/18/15: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: OROZCO, ROBERT A; Defendant; Attorney: OROZCO, ROBERT A; Defendant; Attorney: OROZCO, ROBERT A

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: CRC Rule 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: Jury trial requested by all parties; T/E 8 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: Jury Trial 04/25/2016; T/E 8 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 04:30 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: T/E 8 DAYS FCMC 4/15/16 TD 4/25/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: Granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to request for production and form interrogatories, general.

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 03/11/2015; Served: 03/11/2015; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: filed by Robert Orozco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO COLLEGE COMMUNITY SERVICES BY PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO PROVIDENCE COMMUNITY SERVICES LLC BY PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 18, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 18, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_4 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for BILSON, KARI (PL-1). Received from ATTORNEY'S CERTIFIED SERVICES, check no(s) 10473. Receipt #826386 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY EMILY A. RUBY CMC SET 9/18/15 @8:00AM DEPT 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY EMILY A. RUBY

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.