This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 14:27:00 (UTC).

BILLINGS VS RYZE CLAIM SOLUTIONS

Case Summary

On 08/22/2017 BILLINGS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RYZE CLAIM SOLUTIONS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1949

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BILLINGS, LESLIE

Defendants

RYZE CLAIM SOLUTIONS, LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS EAGLE ADJUSTING SERVICES, INC., AN INDIANA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

RYZE CLAIM SOLUTIONS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HATCHER, JASON T.

Defendant Attorney

ARCHIBALD, CHRISTOPHER J.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/05/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:4

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proof of service party served does not conform to the complaint file n serve.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: POS-040 Re: Notice of Assignment; OSC & CMC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 11:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Removal of Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketAnswer to First Amended Complaint - Comment: AS TO RYZE CLAIM SOLUTIONS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proof of service party served does not conform to the complaint file n serve.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/02/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/05/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

For Cowrt Use On

Attorney or Party without Atlorney:

DAVID P. MYERS (SBN 206137)

ANN ITENDRIX (SBN 258285)

THE MYERS LAW GROUP, A.P.C.

9327 FAIRWAY VIEW PLACE SULTE 100

RANCIIQ CUCAMONGA, CA 21730 |

Telephone No: FriX No:

SUPERIOR COURT QF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF KERN

Plaimi: LESLIE BILLINGS, an Individual

BCV-17-101949

1. Al the time of service | was at least 18 yearsparty (o this action. 2. 1served copics of the SUMMONS., COMPLAINT, FIRST AMENDED COMPAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SIIEET.

RYZE CLAIM SOLUTIONS, LLC

3. a Puarty served: GABRIELLLA SANCHEZ (Authorized Agent)

b. Person senved. 4. Address where the party was served: 818 WEST SEVENTH STREET SUHTIZ 930 LOS ANGELES, CA 90017

5. Iserved the party: a. by personal service. On Nov 02 2017 at 1:40 pm I personally delivered the documents listed 1n 1tem 2 to the party or

person authorized to receive service of process for the party.

(1) (Busincss) A person at least 18 years of age apparently in charge at the oflice or usual place of business of the person to be served. I informedgeneral nature of the papers.

6 The “Notice to the Person Served" (on the Summons)was completed as follows: d. On behalf of Ryze Claim Solutions, LLC under the following Code of Civil Procedure section 415.95

Recoverabic Cost Per CCP 1033.5(aX4xB)

d. The Fee for Service was: $50.00 Iam: (3) registered California process server

7. Person Wheo Served Papers: 8. Tamar Ravid

b. BythcBookAttorncyService e. 3637 Glendon Avenue Suite 203 (i) Owner Los Angeles, CA 90034 (ii) Registration No.: 5947 c. (818)445-7448 (iii) County: Los Angeles

(v) Expiration Date;

8. 1 declare under penalty of perjury under the laws of the State of California that the foregoing is true and correcr

Date: [1/03/2017 o : {aman and . o etttV149 et

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ryze Claims Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARCHIBALD CHRISTOPHER J.