This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 07:20:14 (UTC).

BILL WRIGHT, INC. VS PRECISION BODYWORKS

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 BILL WRIGHT, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PRECISION BODYWORKS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1011

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BILL WRIGHT, INC.

Defendant

PRECISION BODYWORKS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal Before Hearing (CS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: As to Precision Bodyworks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: BILL WRIGHT, INC.; Served: 01/14/20201:10 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: As to Sergio Suarez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: Returned Via S.A.S.E

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.