This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 05:21:35 (UTC).

BIAS VS MCMILLIN CAPELLA

Case Summary

On 10/11/2013 BIAS filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against MCMILLIN CAPELLA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brumfield, Lorna H., Clark, Thomas S., Schuett, Stephen D. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0507

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BIAS, COLE

BIAS, ARICA

ARISMENDEZ, ELIAS

ARISMENDEZ, SUSAN

BARRON, GABRIEL

BARRON, CASSANDRA

BOLICH, RYAN

BRYANT, JONI

BURTRAM, JAMES

BURTRAM, NINA

BUTLER, UTLEY

CASTILLO, DANIEL

CASTILLO, LETICIA

CLAY, HEATHER

CLAY, ANDRE

DE LA ROSA, SIMON

DE LA ROSA, RACHEL

DORAN, MICHAEL

DORAN, AMY

FALLAS, DEANN

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUTHRIE, LORI J

Attorney at SHINNICK & RYAN LLP

1810 State St

San Diego, CA 92101

Other Attorneys

MORGAN, ANDREW M

PRINTZ, MATTHEW H

ELLIOTT, DEBORAH L

SCANLON, TIMOTHY G

RUTHERFORD, KARI L

BORGESON, JAY M

KENNEDY, KEVIN P

ZAPPELLI, VERONIKA J.

ARABI, ARASH S

HAMMONS, WALLACE W

BROMGARD, TODD D

MORROW, WILLIAM D

THOMASIAN, ELIZABETH A

CRESPO, DANIEL A

CREEDE, MARK L

RICHARDSON, MICHAEL S.

CZELUSNIAK, DAVID E

BRUNET, VIOLAINE C

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: William Morrow/Timothy Scanlon Re: Stipulation to set aside default Reason:Cross-defendant's first paper fee is required

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NOTICE OF JURY FEES AND CHECK #166236 OF $150.00; NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES WAS FILED 08/29/17 WITH FEES OF $150.00; DUPLICATE FILING; RECEIPT ATTACHED.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: MAJESTIC ROOFING, INC.'S CROSS COMPLAINT OF MCMILLIN CAPELLA, LLC.'S. MISSING PROOF OF SERVICE. RETURNED VIA MISC. ATTORNEY BIN.

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 10/05/2016: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Further Case Management Conference

**MO - Public further cmc MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont'd from 04/15/2016

Further Case Management Conference

04/15/2016 Minute Order: Further Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Defendant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Defendant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Defendant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Defendant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M

Further Case Management Conference

fcmc MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Defendant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Defendant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Defendant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Defendant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M

Further Case Management Conference

fcmc MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Defendant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Defendant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Defendant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Defendant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M

Further Case Management Conference

fcmc mo: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J; Plaintiff; Attorney: GUTHRIE, LORI J

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 01/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME; 2ND REJECTION. IF ASSOCIATED WITH CROSS DEFENDANTS BROKEN DRUM OF BAKERSFIELD, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION PLEASE PROVIDE THE COURT WITH THAT INFORMATION.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ANSWER. DEFAULT FILED 9/1/17.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: MAJESTIC ROOFING, INC.'S ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF MCMILLIN CAPELLA, LLC.'S. MISSING PROOF OF SERVICE. RETURNED VIA MISC. ATTORNEY BIN

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: JURY FEE DEPOSIT; MISSING FEES OF $150.00

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND CROSS-COMPLAINT UPON THE SECRETARY OF STATE; CASE NUMBER AND CASE NAME ON THE ORDER DOES NOT REFLECT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR; CROSS DEFENDANT SIERRA CONCRETE DESIGN, INC; CROSS DEFENDANT BURWELL CONCRETE, INC; CROSS DEFENDANT WESTERN HOME ALARMS, INC.

Motion for Leave

Motion for Leave 07/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 6/20/17 Intervener, FINANCIAL PACIFIC INSURANCE COMPANY Motion for Leave to Intervene on behalf of Intervener Financial Pacific Insurance Company on behalf of Socal Finish Carpentry, Inc. a California Suspended Corporation ResID: 25055

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ANSWER FOR BROKEN DRUM INSULATION PREVIOUSLY FILED ON 5/24/17 BY ATTORNEY ARASH S. ARABI FROM BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA LLP.

Further Case Management Conference

CV280507: amended: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: COUNSEL TO FILE UPDATED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENTS AND/OR JOINT LETTER 15 DAYS PRIOR TO NEXT COURT DATE REGARDING STATUS OF CASE.; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Defendant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Defendant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Defendant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Defendant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: MORGAN, ANDREW M

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: continued from 01/08/2020 - Cross-Complaints remain pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/24/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Comment: Re: Request for Dismissal, party was dismissed on 04/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Request for Dismissal, party was dismissed on 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Request for Dismissal, party named to be dismissed filed an answer and name listed on the complaint was inactivated. Please correct and resubmit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: with prejudice as to Pablo Lopez Drywall, Entity form Unknown, ONLY in the Cross-Complaint filed by McMillin Cappela, LLC; et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: with prejudice as to Albert Brown Concrete Inc., a California corporation Only in the Cross-Complaint of McMillin Cappela, LLC; et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: with prejudice, as to DeLeon Enterprises, ONLY in the Cross-Complaint of McMillin Cappela, LLC, et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
443 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2013
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE: AS TO MCMILLIN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, L.P. #6(c) MISSING CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (CCP) CODE / RETURNED VIA MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE: AS TO CENTRAL VALLEY RESIDENTIAL BUILDERS, L.P. #6(c) MISSING CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (CCP) CODE / RETURNED VIA MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2013
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO CORKY MCMILLIN CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC SUB SERVICE 11/15/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: Amount of $1,000.00 for BIAS, COLE (PL-1). Received from ACS, check no(s) 25914. Receipt #745438 for amount of $1,435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for BIAS, COLE (PL-1). Received from ACS, check no(s) 25914. Receipt #745438 for amount of $1,435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 24, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jan 24, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 145

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY LORI J. GUTHRIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY LORI J. GUTHRIE CMC SET 4/9/14 @ 8:15 AM DEPT 17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICHARDSON, MICHAEL S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMASIAN, ELIZABETH A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CREEDE, MARK L