This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:47:51 (UTC).

BH FINANCIAL SERVICES INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS LIBATIQUE

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 BH FINANCIAL SERVICES INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LIBATIQUE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr., Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0217

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BH FINANCIAL SERVICES INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

LIBATIQUE, MARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENOSIAN, JOHN P

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Notice of Order to Show Cause 3.740(f): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Notice of Order to Show Cause 3.740(d): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN COUNTY - RETURNED VIA EFILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of Order to Show Cause 3.740(f): Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of Order to Show Cause 3.740(d): Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN-RETURNED VIA PICK UP FOR JOE DEVERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: PICK UP-JOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: BH FINANCIAL SERVICES INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Awarded Against: LIBATIQUE, MARK; Amount; Damages: $4,841.89; Attorney Fees: $968.37; Costs: $246.00; Total: $6056.26; Party: Names: BH FINANCIAL SERVICES INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; LIBATIQUE, MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: AS TO MARK LIBATIQUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: DOES 1-15 INCLUSIVE ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: FOR MARK LIBATIQUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Proof of service (Mark Libatique)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less