This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 08:20:38 (UTC).

BEST VS BEST (C)

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 BEST filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BEST C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fielder, John L. and Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3114

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fielder, John L.

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BEST, JILL

Respondent

BEST, STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

LEON, DAVID F

CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A

Respondent Attorneys

SIMS, RONALD S

THOMAS, EDWARD J

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 03/27/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 01/09/2020: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: FCCR CONTD FROM 09/05/18 11/13/18 12/17/18 02/14/19, 05/06/19, 06/25/19 08/13/19, 10/01/2019 10/21

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 10/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/19/19 RES BIFURCATE TERMINATE MARITAL STATUS STMNT OF DEC *SERVICE ISSUES*

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 10/01/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: FCCR CONTD FROM 09/05/18 11/13/18 12/17/18 02/14/19, 05/06/19, 06/25/19 08/13/19

Request for Order - Petitioner

Family Centered Case Resolution 08/13/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/13/17 PET S/S CONTD FROM 09/18/17 AND 01/16/18 04/24/18 06/21/18 08/21/18 09/05/18 11/13/18 12/17/18 02/14/19, 05/06/19, 06/25/19

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 06/25/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/13/17 PET S/S CONTD FROM 09/18/17 AND 01/16/18 04/24/18 06/21/18 08/21/18 09/05/18 11/13/18 12/17/18 02/14/19, 05/06/19

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 05/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: FCCR CONTD FROM 09/05/18 11/13/18 12/17/18 02/14/19

Request for Order - Petitioner

Family Centered Case Resolution 02/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/13/17 PET S/S CONTD FROM 09/18/17 AND 01/16/18 04/24/18 06/21/18 08/21/18 09/05/18 11/13/18 12/17/18

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 11/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: FCCR CONTD FROM 09/05/18

Family Centered Case Resolution

Request for Order - Petitioner 09/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/01/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 08/21/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/13/17 PET S/S CONTD FROM 09/18/17 AND 01/16/18 04/24/18 06/21/18

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 06/21/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/13/17 PET S/S CONTD FROM 09/18/17 AND 01/16/18 04/24/18

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 04/24/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/13/17 PET S/S CONTD FROM 09/18/17 AND 01/16/18

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 01/16/2018: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 7/13/17 PET S/S CONTD FROM 9/18; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: LEON, DAVID F; Respondent; Attorney: SIMS, RONALD S

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 09/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 7/13/17 PET S/S CONT'D FROM 8/21/17; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: LEON, DAVID F; Respondent; Attorney: SIMS, RONALD S

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RESPONSE

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 07/13/17 PET S/S CONTD FROM 09/18/17 AND 01/16/18 04/24/18 06/21/18 08/21/18 09/05/18 11/13/18 12/17/18 02/14/19, 05/06/19, 06/25/19 08/13/19, 10/01/19 10/21/19, 01/09/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: FCCR CONTD FROM 09/05/18 11/13/18 12/17/18 02/14/19, 05/06/19, 06/25/19 08/13/19, 10/01/2019 10/21/19, 01/09/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/27/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Family Centered Case Resolution 01/09/2020: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/13/17 PET S/S CONTD FROM 09/18/17 AND 01/16/18 04/24/18 06/21/18 08/21/18 09/05/18 11/13/18 12/17/18 02/14/19, 05/06/19, 06/25/19 08/13/19, 10/01/19 10/21/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 01/09/2020: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: FCCR CONTD FROM 09/05/18 11/13/18 12/17/18 02/14/19, 05/06/19, 06/25/19 08/13/19, 10/01/2019 10/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketJudgment - Status Only - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Comment: MARITAL STATUS ENDS 11/08/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Respondent 10/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 07/13/17 PET S/S CONTD FROM 09/18/17 AND 01/16/18 04/24/18 06/21/18 08/21/18 09/05/18 11/13/18 12/17/18 02/14/19, 05/06/19, 06/25/19 08/13/19, 10/01/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Request for Order - Respondent 10/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: FCCR CONTD FROM 09/05/18 11/13/18 12/17/18 02/14/19, 05/06/19, 06/25/19 08/13/19, 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 10/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/19/19 RES BIFURCATE TERMINATE MARITAL STATUS STMNT OF DEC *SERVICE ISSUES*

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 09/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 7/13/17 PET S/S CONT'D FROM 8/21/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketResponsive Declaration - Comment: HRG 09/18/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketStipulation to Continue and Order - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: NEW HEARING: 9/18/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Stipulated Continuance; Comment: 07/13/17 PET S/S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less