This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 21:55:17 (UTC).

BEST REAL ESTATE SOLUTIONS, LLC VS KELLY

Case Summary

On 04/15/2016 BEST REAL ESTATE SOLUTIONS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KELLY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0061

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEST REAL ESTATE SOLUTIONS, LLC

Defendant

KELLY, JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KUMMER, DIXON G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: BEST REAL ESTATE SOLUTIONS, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 117 Olive Street, Taft , Ca 93268 Kern County; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against: KELLY, JAMES; Party: Name: BEST REAL ESTATE SOLUTIONS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Returned Original Via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered - Comment: As To James Kelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: Possesion Only As To James Kelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Posting As To All Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Posting As To James Kelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • DocketDeclaration and Order to Post Filed - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Comment: Returned Original via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • DocketEx Parte Application / Petition - Comment: For Order That Summons Be Served By Posting and Mailing; Declarations of Dixon G. Kummer and Michael Connery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: As To Any and All Unknown Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: As to James Kelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: BEST REAL ESTATE SOLUTIONS, LLC; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 117 OLIVE STREET TAFT, CA 93268

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned Via Counter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less