This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 12:25:46 (UTC).

BERGEVIN VS MOHSEN

Case Summary

On 11/13/2015 BERGEVIN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MOHSEN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0207

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BERGEVIN, NATHANIEL

Respondent

MOHSEN, NADIA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

Ruling 8/9/16 dpg:

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: BERGEVIN, NATHANIEL; MOHSEN, NADIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • DocketAmended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling - Ruling 8/9/16 dpg:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • DocketProperty Declaration - Comment: Petitioner's Community & Quasi-Community Property Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • DocketProperty Declaration - Comment: Petitioner's Separate Property Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.