This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:21:10 (UTC).

BENNETT VS SANDOVAL

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 BENNETT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SANDOVAL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K. and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8403

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BENNETT, TAMMY

COOK, CECELIA

Defendants

SANDOVAL, SAIRA

LOPEZ, DANIEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • NP1500 - Comment: Department: BM Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: TAMMY BENNETT (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. CECELIA COOK (PL-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. SAIRA SANDOVAL (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. DANIEL LOPEZ (DE-2) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. CASE REFERRED TO MEDIATION *************************************************************************************** PARTIES DECLINED MEDIATION. ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION WITNESSES ARE EXCLUDED FROM THE COURTROOM. PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. SAIRA SANDOVAL (DE-1) EXHIBIT NUMBER A HERETOFORE MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION IS ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. SAIRA SANDOVAL (DE-1) EXHIBIT NUMBER B HERETOFORE MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION IS ADMITTED INTO EVIDENCE. THE FOLLOWING WITNESSES ARE DULY SWORN AND TESTIFY ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF: VERNON THOMAS MOWRY. THE FOLLOWING WITNESSES ARE DULY SWORN AND TESTIFY ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF: DOMENICA LISK. JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFFS: CECELIA COOK AND TAMMY BENNETT AGAINST DEFENDANTS: DANIEL LOPEZ AND SAIRA SANDOVAL FOR PRINCIPAL $$1359.00 COSTS $0. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: THE DEFENDANT SHALL PAY THE PLAINTIFF'S FILING FEE OF $30.00 DIRECTLY TO THE COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF MAILING OF THE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, AFTER EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • 4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • Small Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: Parties Present Plaintiff: BENNETT, TAMMY; Defendant: SANDOVAL, SAIRA; Plaintiff: COOK, CECELIA; Defendant: LOPEZ, DANIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: lopez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Request to Waive Court Fees - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 481

    Read MoreRead Less