This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:33:29 (UTC).

BENEFICIAL STATE BANK VS MORALES

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 BENEFICIAL STATE BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MORALES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5929

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENEFICIAL STATE BANK, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO FINANCE AND THRIFT COMPANY

Defendant

MORALES, NICHOLAS ERIK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVER, STEVEN A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: BENEFICIAL STATE BANK, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO FINANCE AND THRIFT COMPANY; Awarded Against: MORALES, NICHOLAS ERIK; Amount; Damages: $7,610.81; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 17.99 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $288.96; Attorney Fees: $1,297.33; Costs: $314.50; Total: $9511.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Against Nicholas Erik Morales

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketOriginal Promissory Note Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Rafaela Lockridge Pursuant to CCP 585(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: As to Nicholas Erik Morales

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1 - 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO NICHOLAS ERIK MORALES, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less