This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:33:40 (UTC).

BENEFICIAL STATE BANK VS EDWARDS

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 BENEFICIAL STATE BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EDWARDS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5930

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENEFICIAL STATE BANK

Defendants

T'KEYAH EDWARDS AKA T'KEYAH ANTONAY EDWARDS

AMARI ROBERTS AKA AMARI BREESHAYE ROBERTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVER, STEVEN A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: County of San Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: of Unsuccessful Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: County of San Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: BENEFICIAL STATE BANK; Awarded Against: T'KEYAH EDWARDS AKA T'KEYAH ANTONAY EDWARDS; AMARI ROBERTS AKA AMARI BREESHAYE ROBERTS; Amount; Damages: $7,510.85; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 13.99 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $399.09; Attorney Fees: $1,235.74; Costs: $493.50; Total: $9639.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Against Tkeyah Edwards aka Tkeyah Antonay Edwards and Amari Roberts aka Amari Breeshaye Roberts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Request for Dismissal of Does

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: as to AMARI ROBERTS aka AMARI BREESHAVE ROBERTS; and T'KEYAH EDWARDS aka T'KEYAH ANTONAY EDWARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: As to T'Keyah Edwards aka T'Keyah Antonay Edwards. Sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: 2 ATTEMPTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO AMARI ROBERTS, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/01/2018; Served: 10/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less