This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 12:12:49 (UTC).

BENEFICIAL STATE BANK, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO PAN AMERICAN BANK VS MARTINEZ BURROWS

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 BENEFICIAL STATE BANK, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO PAN AMERICAN BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARTINEZ BURROWS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Witt, Gary R., Phillips, Craig G., Staley, H.A. "Skip", Turner, Jerold L. and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0135

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Witt, Gary R.

Phillips, Craig G.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Turner, Jerold L.

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENEFICIAL STATE BANK, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO PAN AMERICAN BANK

Defendant

MARTINEZ BURROWS, JESSICA DAWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVER, STEVEN A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Turner, Jerold L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: Re: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: BENEFICIAL STATE BANK, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO PAN AMERICAN BANK; Awarded Against: MARTINEZ BURROWS, JESSICA DAWN; Amount; Damages: $10,261.45; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 17.99 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $734.16; Attorney Fees: $1,892.90; Costs: $595.00; Total: $13483.51; Party: Names: BENEFICIAL STATE BANK, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO PAN AMERICAN BANK; MARTINEZ BURROWS, JESSICA DAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Comment: As to Jessica Dawn Martinez Burrows Total $13,483.51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Of Rafaela Lockridge Pursuant to CCP 585 (d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Of Steven A. Silver Regarding Interest and Attorney Fees Calculation Pursuant to CCP 585 (d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without Prejudice as to Does 1 to 10 Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to Jessica Dawn Martinez Burrows

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service As To Jessica Dawn Martinez Burrows

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: Attempted To Serve Jessica Dawn Martinez Burrows

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: Attempted To Serve Jessica Dawn Martinez Burrows

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: BENEFICIAL STATE BANK, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO PAN AMERICAN BANK; Served: 12/12/201612:41 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE SECTIONS 1812.10 AND/OR 2984.4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less