This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/04/2021 at 05:23:58 (UTC).

BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA INC VS AYALA

Case Summary

On 08/27/2010 BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AYALA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6335

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2010

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendants

AYALA, TOMASA R.

AYALA, DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARIS, JEFFREY A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2015
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • DocketNotice of Termination or Modification of Stay (CM-181) - Comment: FILED BY PATRICK KAVANAGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceeding - Comment: FILED BY PATRICK KAVANAGH,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN/MONEY/VG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION (PL-1). Received from PARIS AND PARIS, LLP, check no(s) 38944. Receipt #702238 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed - Comment: ACCRUED INTEREST: $1,046.64

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • DocketWrit Returned and Filed - Comment: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • DocketWrit Returned and Filed - Comment: KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: RE: DISMISSAL RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED ~ calid=1353730 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4184, CourtDate:09/01/2011, Courtroom:AL, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:2, SessionType:OSC, Judge:GRW, Deputy:AMANDAA, SystemDate:8/31/2010 4:40:43 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2010
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence Filed - Comment: ATTEMPTED SERVICE ON: THOMAS R. AYALA AKA TOMASA AYALA BY: LARRY BILLINGSLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, STATEMENT OF VENUE, ADR INFORMATION PACKAGE WHO SERVED: THOMASA R. AYALA HOW SERVED: BY MAIL DATE SERVED: 9/8/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, STATEMENT OF VENUE, ADR INFORMATION PACKAGE WHO SERVED: DANIEL AYALA HOW SERVED: SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY SERVING JOSE AYALA DATE SERVED: 9/7/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, STATEMENT OF VENUE, ADR INFORMATION PACKAGE WHO SERVED: THOMAS R. AYALA HOW SERVED: BY MAIL DATE SERVED: 9/8/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 01, 2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Sep 01, 2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN THREE HUNDRED SIXTY (360) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(f). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE A DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 17, 2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 17, 2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT AL OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT OR OBTAIN AN ORDER FOR PUBLICATION WITHIN 180 DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.740(d). ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS TEN (10) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE HAS BEEN FILED, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • Docket843W Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint < $10,000 GC 70613(B) (7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $205.00 for BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION (PL-1). Received from PARIS AND PARIS, LLP, check no(s) 27138. Receipt #544845 for amount of $205.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 431

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketComplaint - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Beneficial California Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARIS JEFFREY A.