This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/31/2020 at 09:09:43 (UTC).

BENAVIDES VS VILLALAPANDO (B)

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 BENAVIDES filed a Family - Minor Custody lawsuit against VILLALAPANDO B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn, Cannon, Gloria and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1005

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Minor Custody

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Cannon, Gloria

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BENAVIDES, ERIC

Respondent

VILLALAPANDO, ALYSSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KILPATRICK, MICHAEL R

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 03/26/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 02/03/2020: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 01/02/20 PET C/C C/V 1 MINOR

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Hearing on Waiver of Fees 01/10/2020: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $520.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 1/02/20 PET CC CV 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 2/03/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/26/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Comment: FOAH MUST FILE SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: SELF New Attorney: MICHAEL R KILPATRICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 02/03/2020: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 01/02/20 PET C/C C/V 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY FATHER 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied/Incomplete - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: TOTAL FEES DUE: $520.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Waiver of Fees - Hearing on Waiver of Fees 01/10/2020: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET FW FEES: $520.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: HRG 2/3/2020 DIV. B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: PET $435

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketPetition for Custody

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.