This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:16:35 (UTC).

BELTRAN VS ALVARENGA

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 BELTRAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ALVARENGA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2502

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BELTRAN, VERONICA J

Respondent

ALVARENGA, ANIBAL A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2015
  • Notice Re Payment of Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • Order to Pay Waived Court Fees and Costs - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • Declaration for Default - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • Proposed Judgment - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • Image of Archived Documents - Comment: CASE FILE- CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • Income and Expense Declaration - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • Request to Enter Default - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • Declaration Re Service of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • UCCJEA - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Request to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 694

    Read MoreRead Less