This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 05:23:40 (UTC).

BELLO VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION KERN VALLEY STATE PRISON

Case Summary

On 07/16/2015 BELLO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION KERN VALLEY STATE PRISON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R., Brumfield, Lorna H., Chapin, Sidney P. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0505

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Chapin, Sidney P.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELLO, PRISCILLA

Defendant

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION KERN VALLEY STATE PRISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OREN, ERIC P

Defendant Attorney

LOGAN-STERN, MICHELE

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 9-27-17: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 08/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filing Date: 8--17-17 Moving Party: Defendant California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Kern Valley State Prison Ex parte Application for an order continuing trial or in the alternative an application for an order shortening time to hear motion to continue trial date

Ruling

Ruling 08/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses 10/05/2016: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Plaintiff, Priscilla Bello Motion to Compel Further Responses to Discovery from Defendant, CDCR and Kern Valley State Prison; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: OREN, ERIC P; Defendant; Attorney: LOGAN-STERN, MICHELE

Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition)

Motion for Order (Pre-Disposition) 09/08/2016: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: Filed 8/16/16, by Defendant, CDCR and Kern Valley State Prison. Motion for Protective Order for Relief from Excessive Discovey. ResID: 17738; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: OREN, ERIC P; Defendant; Attorney: LOGAN-STERN, MICHELE

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

06/21/2016 Minute Order: Ex Parte to Set Date for MSJ/MSA & Shorten time to Bring Motion to Compel: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING DATE FOR MSJ/MSA AND CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF T0 SHORTEN TIME TO BRING MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF S DEPOSITION, EXPEDITE REVIEW OF TRANSCRIPT, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: OREN, ERIC P; Defendant; Attorney: LOGAN-STERN, MICHELE

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

04/28/16 - M.O. -PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 3/28/16, by Plaintiff, Priscilla Bello. Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Two, from Defendant CDCR and Kern Valley State Prison. ResID: 15606.; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: OREN, ERIC P; Defendant; Attorney: LOGAN-STERN, MICHELE

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

04/08/16 M.O. - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES & MOTION TO COMPEL INITIAL RESPONSES: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Discovery from Defendant California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation Kern Valley State Prison; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: OREN, ERIC P; Defendant; Attorney: LOGAN-STERN, MICHELE

Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: OREN, ERIC P; Defendant; Attorney: LOGAN-STERN, MICHELE

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 10/21/2016: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: OREN, ERIC P; Defendant; Attorney: LOGAN-STERN, MICHELE

Ruling

Ruling 10/05/2016: Hearing Time: 04:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 09/20/2016: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 02:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Motion for Leave

Motion for Leave 09/13/2016: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 8/19/16, by Plaintiff, Priscilla Bello. Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint. ResID: 17761; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: OREN, ERIC P; Defendant; Attorney: LOGAN-STERN, MICHELE

Case Status Conference

08/05/16 M.O. CASE STATUS CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: Pursuant to 7/6/16 Ruling. RE: Discovery; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: OREN, ERIC P; Defendant; Attorney: LOGAN-STERN, MICHELE

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

07/06/2016 Minute Order: Motion to Compel Discovery Responses & Motion to Appoint Discovery Referee: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Multiple Motions Held; Comment: Filed 5/31/16, by Plaintiff, Priscilla Bello. Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery for Defendant, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, and Kern Valley State Prison. ResID: 16146. Trial Date: 10/24/2016 Final CMC: 10/21/2016 MSC: 09/23/2016; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: OREN, ERIC P; Defendant; Attorney: LOGAN-STERN, MICHELE

Ruling

07/05/16 - RULING ON EX PARTE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

06/17/16 - M.O. EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CLARIFICATION OF MAY 20, 2016 RULING: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: for Clarification of May 20, 2016 Ruling. On behalf of California Department of Corrections.; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: OREN, ERIC P; Defendant; Attorney: LOGAN-STERN, MICHELE

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: t/e 10 to 12 days jury for both sides

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: j/t 10/02/17 9am dept 11 t/e 10 to 12 days jury for both sides

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Documents Submitted - Comment: Defendant CDCR's Amended Exhibit List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Documents Submitted - Comment: Plaintiff's Motion In Limine No. 7 To Exclude Undisclosed Witnesses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Documents Submitted - Comment: Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Amended MIL No. 1 and MIL Nos. 6,7,9 and 10

    Read MoreRead Less
193 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2015
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs second cause of action for Unlawful Sexual Harassment in Violation of U.S.C. 42 2000(e), et seq. and fifth cause of action for Retaliation in Violation of U.S.C. 42 2000(e), et seq. shall be dismissed against KVSP in this matter (Case No. BCV-15-100505 DRL). This dismissal does not affect Plaintiffs remaining claims against Defendant KVSP in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant KVSP will have 30 days from the date it receives notice of this Order by this Court to file an Answer to this action. ***JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION KERN VALLEY STATE PRISON; PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO: ERIC P. OREN, ESQ RE: PROOF OF SERVICE REASON: ITEM #6 MISSING CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • DocketErrata - Comment: Submitted by Eric P. Oren, Esq.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/6/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: BELLO, PRISCILLA; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.