This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 14:33:55 (UTC).

BELL VS J.R. JANSEN, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/26/2014 BELL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against J R JANSEN, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brehmer, Charles R., Brumfield, Lorna H., Chapin, Sidney P., Clark, Thomas S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3579

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brehmer, Charles R.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Chapin, Sidney P.

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

BELL, LEANNE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

J.R. JANSEN, INC.

INDIAN WELLS VETERINARY HOSPITAL

J.R. JANSEN, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

MEYERS, NEAL S

Defendant Attorney

Knickerbocker, Richard L

 

Court Documents

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 06/27/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: DEFEAULT. COUNTINUED FROM 04/23/2019

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notice of ruling rejected: Duplicate filing. Returned via efile

Ruling

Ruling 08/30/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Motion for Terminating Sanctions

Motion for Terminating Sanctions 10/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Motion for (1) Terminating Sanctions against Defendant and Cross-Complainant J.R. Jansen. continued by court on 08/30/2018

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Tom Wiseman Re: Request for entry of judgment and supporting documents Reason: Per Judge Thomas S Clark. Please make the following corrections: (1) Request for entry of default box is required to be marked (2) Correct date on 1a to reflect the date of first amended complaint and (3) Mark 1c and complete 1c

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: No Default on file; 1d does not conform to the First Amended Complaint; Bankruptcy filed 2/3/16

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Request for Court Judgment; 11 does not conform to FAC

Case Status Conference

Case Status Conference 04/23/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: DEFAULT BY DECLARATION

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw (Pre-Disposition)

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw (Pre-Disposition) 02/28/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1/25/18 Defendant, J.R. JANSEN, INC. Motion to be Relieved as Counsel ResID: 28975

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: Proof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Status Conference - Case Status Conference 06/27/2019: Case Status Conference 07/31/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cross-complaint remains pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: or Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketJudgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: After having reviewed and considered Plaintiff Leanne Bell's Request for Court Judgment following Order Granting Terminating Sanctions and Striking Defendant's Answer and all declarations and documentation filed in support thereof, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: 1. As to Plaintiffs First Cause of Action for Breach of Contract, judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Leanne Bell against Defendant J.R. Jansen, Inc. Plaintiff shall recover $42,750.00 from J.R. Jansen, Inc. on this cause of action plus interest from February 2, 2014 to the present. 2. As to Plaintiffs Second Cause of Action for Failure to Pay Overtime Wages, judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Leanne Bell against Defendant J.R. Jansen, Inc. Plaintiff shall recover $4,829.73 from J.R. Jansen, Inc. on this cause of action plus interest from February 2, 2014 and reasonable attorney's fees and costs. 3. As to Plaintiffs Third Cause of Action for Failure to Provide Meal Periods, judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Leanne Bell against Defendant J.R. Jansen, Inc. Plaintiff shall recover $178.14 from J.R. Jansen, Inc. on this cause of action plus interest from February 2, 2014 and reasonable attorney's fees and costs. 4. As to Plaintiffs Fourth Cause of Action for Failure to Provide Accurate Wage Statements, judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Leanne Bell against Defendant J.R. Jansen, Inc. Plaintiff shall recover $850.00 from J.R. Jansen, Inc. on this causeof action plus interest from February 2, 2014 and reasonable attorney's fees and costs. 5. As to Plaintiffs Fifth Cause of Action for Failure to Timely Pay All Final Wages, judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Leanne Bell against Defendant J.R. Jansen, Inc. Plaintiff shall recover $14,250.00 from J.R. Jansen, Inc. on this cause of action plus interest from February 2, 2014 and reasonable attorney's fees and costs. 6. As to Plaintiffs Sixth Cause of Action for Violation of California Business and Professions Code Section 17200, judgment is entered Plaintiff Leanne Bell against Defendant J.R. Jansen, Inc. 7. Plaintiff Leanne Bell shall also recover from Defendant J.R. Jansen, Inc. pre-judgment interest, reasonable attorney's fees and costs as provided herein. 8. Plaintiffs total recovery from each of the causes of action set forth herein, before pre-judgment interest, reasonable attorney's fees and costs is $62,857.90. At the legal rate (10%) commencing February 2, 2014, Plaintiff Leanne Bell shall recover from J.R.Jansen, Inc. $33,994.85 in interest as of June 30, 2019 and increasing at a daily rate of $17.22 thereafter until this judgment is entered, 9. Plaintiff Leanne Bell shall recover from Defendant J.R. Jansen, Inc. $55,372.50 in attorney's fees. 10. Plaintiff Leanne Bell shall recover from Defendant J.R. Jansen, Inc. $7,369.10 in costs. 11. In total, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED, that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Leanne Bell against Defendant J.R. Jansen, Inc. in the amount of $159,594.35 increasing by $17.22 in daily interest from June 30, 2019 until the date of entry ofthis judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: as to defendant J.R. Jansen, Inc a California Corporation doing business as Indian Wells Veterinary Hospital

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: of request for court judgment; memorandum of points and authorities in support of request for court judgment; Declaration of Neal S Meyers in support of court judgment; Declaration of Tom Wiseman in support of Request for Court Judgment; Declaration of Leanne Bell in support of Request for Court Judgment and Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Leanne Bell in support of plaintiff Leanne Bell's request for court judgment following order granting terminating sanctions and striking defendant's answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Neal S. Meyers in support of plaintiff Leanne Bell's request for court judgment following order granting terminating sanctions and striking defendant's answer

    Read MoreRead Less
216 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2015
  • Docket4159 Order to Show Cause - (N20a - CRC 3.110) - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Original Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint - Comment: FILED BY HAYLEY SCHWARTZKOPF ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • DocketElectronically Faxed Document(s) Received - Comment: EFAX: Accepted Confirmation: S1500CV283579_150303_104114 AMENDED SUMMONS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT eFax document: FAX-30987.PDF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 11, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Mar 11, 2015 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for BELL, LEANNE (PL-1). Received from ATTORNEY'S CERTIFIED SERVICES, check no(s) 10075. Receipt #812583 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: FILED BY HAYLEY D. SCHWARTZKOPF, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY HAYLEY D. SCHWARTZKOPF, ESQ. CMC SET 5/29/15 @8:15AM DEPT 17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KNICKERBOCKER RICHARD L