This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 04:47:14 (UTC).

BELL, ET AL VS SIMMS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/10/2017 BELL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SIMMS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr., Bittleston, Dawn and Zulfa, David. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0007

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

Zulfa, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BELL, KENNETH L.

BELL, AMBER D.

Defendants

SIMMS, JOSEPH

KLINKER, ALLAN

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 03/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: BELL, KENNETH L.; Plaintiff: BELL, AMBER D.; Defendant: SIMMS, JOSEPH; Defendant: KLINKER, ALLAN

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Contested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: BELL, KENNETH L.; BELL, AMBER D.; Awarded Against: SIMMS, JOSEPH; KLINKER, ALLAN; Amount; Damages: $115.02; Costs: $90.00; Total: $205.02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 03/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: BELL, KENNETH L.; Plaintiff: BELL, AMBER D.; Defendant: SIMMS, JOSEPH; Defendant: KLINKER, ALLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Proof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: FOR JOSEPH SIMMS--------------FILED ON DEMAND----------------

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Proof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: FOR ALLEN KLINKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Small Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Order on Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearings - Judicial Officer: Zulfa, David; Comment: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Request for Postponement of Small Claims Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: BELL, KENNETH L., BELL, AMBER D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.