This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/14/2021 at 10:24:54 (UTC).

BEHNIWAL ET AL VS WONDERFUL ORCHARDS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 BEHNIWAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WONDERFUL ORCHARDS LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1738

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SINGH, JAY

BEHNIWAL, BHUPINDER

COUNTY LINE FUEL & TRAVEL CENTER LLC

SANGHA, AJMAIL SINGH

DELANO FOOD STORE LLC

COUNTY LINE TRAVEL CENTER LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WONDERFUL ORCHARDS LLC

PONCE, CANDIDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROJAS-INIGUEZ, DANAY S.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

JAVAHERIFAR, MICHAEL

CHRISTOVICH, JEFFREY J

FOX, DANA ALDEN

Cross Defendant Attorney

CZESHINSKI, MICHAEL J

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 05/25/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 5/3/21 - related case being heard in D17 at 830am same date 5/25/21

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 05/03/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 3/29/21

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Substitution of Attorney: Filing Party to cal Clerk's Office

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Sub of Attorney - 3rd Rejection. Please see previous 2 rejections - Substitution of Attorney was already filed on 3/25/2021. If amending, please specify on Document.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Substitution of Attorney: Duplicate Filing - The Substitution of Attorney for Wonderful Orchards was filed on 3/25/21 at 4:47 pm - this is a second rejection. If this an Amended document please indicate that on the documents.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Substitution of Attorney: Duplicate Filing - Substitution of Attorney is already on File.

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 03/29/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont't from 1/25/21

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 01/25/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proof of Service. Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt must be attached to Mandatory Judicial Council for Proof of Service form POS-010.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/10/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 10

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCase Consolidated - Child Case - Comment: All future filings and hearings are to proceed in the Parent/Lead Case BCV-20-101043.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 05/25/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 5/3/21 - related case being heard in D17 at 830am same date 5/25/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 05/03/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 3/29/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Motion and Motion to Consolidate Actions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCross Complaint - Comment: Cross Complaint - $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint - $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Candido Ponce via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Wonderful Orchards LLC via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 07/28/20201:25 PM; Served: 07/28/20202:45 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/10/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WONDERFUL ORCHARDS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAVAHERIFAR, MICHAEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTOVICH JEFFREY J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOX DANA ALDEN ESQ.