This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/03/2020 at 10:52:58 (UTC).

BEHLE VS SAFETY TEK INDUSTRIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 BEHLE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SAFETY TEK INDUSTRIES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0017

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEHLE, JOHN

Defendant

SAFETY TEK INDUSTRIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN, BEN

Defendant Attorney

ALEXANDER, WILLIAM L

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:10

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: as to Safety Tek Industries, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Inability - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant, Safety Tek Industries, Inc., shall have until April 22, 2020, to file a responsive pleading in the above-referenced matter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Inability to Respond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Safety Tek Industries, Inc. via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 02/12/202011:07 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.