This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:57:12 (UTC).

Beeson VS Thrasher, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 Beeson filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Thrasher. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., DelPellegrino, Victoria, Spann, Richard E., Pritchard, Kenneth G., Woodward, Cory J. and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0103

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

DelPellegrino, Victoria

Spann, Richard E.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Woodward, Cory J.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beeson, Gerald

Defendants

Thrasher, Amy

Thrasher, Herb

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition

MO 08/19/15: Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition

MO 08/19/15 DIV A: Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: Beeson, Gerald; Defendant: Thrasher, Herb

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Party: Names: Beeson, Gerald; Thrasher, Herb; Thrasher, Amy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: MONEY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: MONEY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: DelPellegrino, Victoria; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition - MO 08/19/15 DIV A: Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: Beeson, Gerald; Defendant: Thrasher, Herb

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition - MO 08/19/15: Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • Application and Declaration - Comment: FOR EX PARTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Ineligible - Judicial Officer: Woodward, Cory J.; Comment: Gerald Beeson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Gerald Beeson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Incomplete - Judicial Officer: Spann, Richard E.; Comment: GERALD BEESON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: Beeson, Gerald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees - Comment: GERALD BEESON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less