This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:51:31 (UTC).

BEENHAM VS BEENHAM

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 BEENHAM filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BEENHAM. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Loo, Cynthia L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1789

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Loo, Cynthia L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BEENHAM, ANDREA J

Respondent

BEENHAM, EWAN G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

AZEMIKA, ANTHONY P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney - Comment: ANTHONY P AZEMIKA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 10/26/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketStipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.