This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:21:18 (UTC).

BEEBE VS CALIFORNIA CARDIAC

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 BEEBE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CALIFORNIA CARDIAC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6620

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEEBE, MICHAEL

Defendant

CALIFORNIA CARDIAC SURGEONS DR PUREWAL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 5/28/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • NP1500 - Comment: Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, AFTER EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: MICHAEL BEEBE (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. DR. PUREWAL APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR CALIFORNIA CARDIAC SURGEONS. *************************************************************************************** PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. KRISTI MADDEN DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. THE FOLLOWING WITNESSES ARE DULY SWORN AND TESTIFY ON BEHALF OF THE DEFENDANT: DR. PUREWAL EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY DEFENSE. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT AGAINST PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • 4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • Small Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: Parties Present Plaintiff: BEEBE, MICHAEL; Defendant: CALIFORNIA CARDIAC SURGEONS DR PUREWAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO CALIFORNIA CARDIAC SURGERY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO MICHAEL BEEBE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 678

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Request to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO MICHAEL BEEBE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: ENDORSED COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF WITH FEE WAIVER GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less