This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:52:30 (UTC).

BEAVERS VS SCHNEIDER NATIONAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 BEAVERS filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against SCHNEIDER NATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chapin, Sidney P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0611

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chapin, Sidney P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEAVERS, JUSTIN TERRELL

Defendant

SCHNEIDER NATIONAL, INC.

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s):CASE HAS BEEN REMOVED TO FEDERAL DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketNotice of Removal of Action (JBSIS) - Comment: Filed by Sabrina A. Beldner, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Schneider National, Inc. Personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURN VIA COUNTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: REQUEST TO WAIVE FEES GRANTED BY JUDGE **CHAPIN** AS TO JUSTIN BEAVERS. REQUEST FOR ADDTIONAL FEES DENIED BY JUDGE **CHAPIN** AS TO JUSTIN TERRELL BEAVERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/6/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Additional Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.