This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:17:27 (UTC).

BEARDEN-SHADDEN VS BEARDEN

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 BEARDEN-SHADDEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BEARDEN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4718

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEARDEN - SHADDEN, KRISTAL

Petitioner

BEARDEN-SHADDEN, KRISTAL

Defendant

BEARDEN

Respondent

BEARDEN, MATTHEW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2013
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: RES: JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Comment: STATUS ENDS 1/11/2014 RLM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • Request to Enter Default - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • Declaration for Default - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Request to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • CONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 523

    Read MoreRead Less