This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/19/2021 at 09:32:30 (UTC).

BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT VS WILLDAN ENGINEERING

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against WILLDAN ENGINEERING. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2949

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY SERVICE DISTRICT

Defendant

WILLDAN ENGINEERING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WULFSBERG, J TODD

Defendant Attorney

ERIGERO, STEPHEN J

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 04/02/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division:17

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: J.Todd Wulsfberg Re: Summons Reason: Summons do not conform with complaint.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Case Consolidation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) - Comment: as to BCV-19-101809

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Willdan Engineering, a California Corporation via personal service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 12/22/202010:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: J.Todd Wulsfberg Re: Summons Reason: Summons do not conform with complaint.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 04/02/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division:17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: CERTIFICATE OF MERIT FOR ACTION ARISING OUT OF PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE OF A REGISTERED PROFESSIONAL ENGINEER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY SERVICE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERIGERO STEPHEN J.