This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/01/2022 at 11:33:38 (UTC).

BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT VS J.R. SIMPLOT COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/15/2022 BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against J R SIMPLOT COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0363

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT

Defendants

J.R. SIMPLOT COMPANY

NUTRIEN AG SOLUTIONS, INC.

OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION

PUREGRO COMPANY

SHELL OIL COMPANY

SOUTHERN VALLEY CHEMICAL COMPANY

THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY

TRICAL, INC.

WILBUR-ELLIS COMPANY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBINS, TODD E

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 06/01/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: H

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) - Comment: Notice of Related Cases (CRC 3.300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 06/01/2022 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN VALLEY CHEMICAL COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Trical Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where BEAR VALLEY COMMUNITY SERVICES DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA COMMUNITY SERVICE DISTRICT is a litigant