This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:42:41 (UTC).

BARTOUMIAN VS BROOKS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/17/2017 BARTOUMIAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BROOKS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Green, Kenneth R., Jr. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0166

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARTOUMIAN, ARSHAK

Defendants

BROOKS, JULIE A

BROOKS, FAITH A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: BARTOUMIAN, ARSHAK; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 21410 GOLDEN HILLS BLVD. #C TEHACHAPI CA 93561 KERN COUNTY; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: BROOKS, FAITH A; BROOKS, JULIE A; Party: Name: BARTOUMIAN, ARSHAK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN-RETURNED VIA PICK TO ALL VALLEY COURT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice of Commencement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Request to set trial

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: FOR FAITH A BROOKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketAmended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: BARTOUMIAN, ARSHAK; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: NEW UD CASE

    Read MoreRead Less