This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 12:13:38 (UTC).

BART VS BART

Case Summary

On 12/29/2016 BART filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BART. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0432

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BART, CHRISTINA LYNN

Respondent

BART, WILLIAM EDWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CURTIN, RICHARD P

Respondent Attorney

WHITE, CYNTHIA

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Notice of Unavailability of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: Christina Lynn Bart New Attorney: Richard P. Curtin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Notice of Limited Scope Representation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Proof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.