This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 06:11:25 (UTC).

BARRY VS BARRY

Case Summary

On 06/22/2017 BARRY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BARRY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Pritchard, Kenneth G. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0200

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

KATHLEEN, BARRY A

BARRY, KATHLEEN A

Respondent

BARRY, NEAL E

 

Court Documents

Default

Default 08/09/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Petitioner: BARRY, KATHLEEN A

Ruling

Ruling 07/31/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Comment: Modification of Spousal Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing; Party: Names: BARRY, KATHLEEN A; BARRY, NEAL E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Comment: STATUS DATE 12/23/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketStipulation RE: Judge Pro Tempore filed, and incorporated - Comment: herein by reference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault - Default 08/09/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling - Ruling 07/31/2017:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: CNL LEGAL DOC PREP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 07/31/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less