This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 19:30:48 (UTC).

BARRY BENDER VS WORKMED CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/11/2016 BARRY BENDER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WORKMED CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0536

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENDER, BARRY

Defendants

WORKMED CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

R.P. DUNNUM, MD INC.

DUNNUM, RUSSELL P.

CALHOUN, KEVIN, M.D.

WORKMED CALIFORNIA, APC

R.P. DUNNUM, MD, INC., AKA RUSSELL P. DUNNUM, INC DBA WORKMED, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ENTITY NUMBER C3545970

CALHOUN, KEVIN

WORKMED CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORA

MACARTHUR, ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KESTNER, DAVID

Defendant Attorney

MCNEIL, MALCOLM S.

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Duplicate filing of Dismissal, Proof of service needs to be re-submitted with proper face page.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proof of service needs proper face page.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Date in 1(b) has already past. Please specify a different date.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Answer to First Amended Complaint returned via USPS

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 10/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 06/30/2017

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 9-13-17: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 06/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: Motion - Missing ResID

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 6-1-17: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 03/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KESTNER, DAVID

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) 01/31/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re: default judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KESTNER, DAVID

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proposed Order rejected in File & Serve

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KESTNER, DAVID

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 09/12/2016: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KESTNER, DAVID

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing 3.110 MO: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: t/e 1 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: court trial 10/15/18 t/e 1 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketMotion to Quash (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 08/03/2018, Defendants: Kevin Calhoun, M.D. and Workmed Claifornia, APC., Motin to Quash Subpoenas and Monetary Sactions for Misuse of the Discovery Process, ResID: 32643

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Defendants Kevin Calhoun, M.D. and Workmed California, APC Taking Off-Calendar thier Motion to Quash Subpoenas and Monetary Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Duplicate filing of Dismissal, Proof of service needs to be re-submitted with proper face page.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proof of service needs proper face page.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Without prejudice as to entire action.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Date in 1(b) has already past. Please specify a different date.

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketApplication and Order - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: to Serve the California Secretary of State

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: 2 attempts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: AS TO WORKMED CALIFORNIA,1 ATTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - **MO w/Declaration of Mailing 3.110 MO: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: On Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re:CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 6/27/16 Hearing Time: 830AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

ARENT FOX LLP

555 West Fifth Street, 48th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1065

Telephone: 213.629.7400

Facsimile: 213.629.7401

Email: malcolm.mcneil@arentfox.com ismael.bautista@arentfox.com

e e ———————e e e e et ™

! . \ | Attorneys for Defendants KEVIN CALHOUN, M.D. and WORKMED CALIFORNIA, APC

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF KERN }

BARRY BENDER, CASE NO. BCV-16-100536 Plaintiff, DEFENDANTS KEVIN CALHOUN, M.D.’S AND WORKMED CALIFORNIA, APC’S V. ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED

COMPLAINT

WORKMED CALIFORNIA. a California Corporation, and Does 1 to 25, Defendant. Judge: Hon. David R. Lampe |

Action Filed: March 11, 2016 Tral Date: N/A

Defendants Kevin Calhoun, M.D. (*Dr. Calhoun™) and Workmed California, APC (“Workmed™) (together, “Defendants’™) hereby answer the First Amended Complaint (the

“Complaint™) of Plaintift Barry Bender (“Plaintiff”) as follows:

Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 431.30(d), Detendants generally deny each

| GENERAL DENIJAL i

- . . ~, . . ’ and every allegation contained in the Complaint, deny that Plaintiff has suffered any injury. i

damage or loss by reason of any act or omission on their part, deny specifically that Plaintift has |