This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/27/2020 at 10:41:42 (UTC).

BARRIOS VS SOLORIO

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 BARRIOS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SOLORIO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tafoya, Robert S. and Loo, Cynthia L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0004

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tafoya, Robert S.

Loo, Cynthia L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BARRIOS, GUSTAVO

Respondent

SOLORIO, MARIA GUADALUPE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

DULCICH, JOHN S

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 05/14/2020: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: Child Custody & Visitation

Ruling

Ruling 03/19/2020: Hearing Time: 12:30 PM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketMediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 05/14/2020: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: Child Custody & Visitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/19/2020: Hearing Time: 12:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketResponsive Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: Re: Child Custody & Visitation Mediation Date: 03/24/2020 Hearing Date: 03/27/2020 Hearing Time: 9:00 a.m. Department: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketRevenue Recovery Document-Agreement to Satisfy Court - Comment: Ordered Fines

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver-Denied-Payments Authorized - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: BARRIOS, GUSTAVO; Served: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.